MA S769 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H1249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H1249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to update Medicaid resource limits for seniors. Health Care Financing.
Title
To update Medicaid resource limits for seniors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Accompanied H1249 |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-05-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1249 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S769 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S769.pdf |