MA S80 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create an electronic backpack for foster children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Creating an electronic backpack for foster children’s educational records
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 2, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S80 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S80.pdf |