MA S810 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure temporary nursing service agency quality. Health Care Financing.
Title
Ensuring temporary nursing service agency quality
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S1788 (Similar To) 2023-05-11 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
S802 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H2817 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H1885 (Similar To) 2023-07-06 - Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H4412 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S802 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H2817 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H1885 (Similar To) 2023-07-06 - Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H4412 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S810 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S810.pdf |