MA S875 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect victims of rape and children conceived during the commission of said offense. The Judiciary.
Title
To protect victims of rape and children conceived during the commission of said offense
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H773 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S875 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S875.pdf |