MD HB1 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring owners or managers of apartment buildings or councils of unit owners of condominiums that contain 10 or more units to provide residents with the opportunity for recycling on or before October 1, 2014; authorizing a county to require an owner or manager of an apartment building or a council of unit owners to report to the county on recycling activities; requiring that the recycling required under the Act be done in accordance with county recycling plans; specifying a civil penalty for a violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Environment - Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (42-2) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-16 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-16 | Third Reading Passed (98-38) | |
2012-03-14 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-13 | Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate McDermott) Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable with Amendments 220418/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2011-09-05 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Apartments
Condominiums
Counties
Inspections
Landlord and Tenant
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Recycling
Reports
Condominiums
Counties
Inspections
Landlord and Tenant
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Recycling
Reports