MD HB10 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "fully online distance education program" to mean a program, originating outside the State, offered by an out-of-state institution in which a student domiciled in Maryland enrolls, 51% or more of the program is offered through electronic distribution, and the Commission determines that the portion of the program offered at a location in the State, if any, does not require a specified certificate of approval; etc.
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Fully Online Distance Education - Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-3) (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-3) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-02-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {824269/1 Report Adopted |
2015-02-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2015-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2014-10-22 | House | Pre-filed |