MD HB1019 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination date of specified provisions of law establishing the Adults with Developmental Disabilities Citizen's Advisory Committee in Prince George's County.
Title
Prince George's County - Adults With Developmental Disabilities Citizen's Advisory Committee - Sunset Repeal PG 421-14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632 |
2014-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Developmental Disabilities
Disabled
Prince George's County
Public Health
Sunset
Developmental Disabilities
Disabled
Prince George's County
Public Health
Sunset