MD HB102 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 54
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 54
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from .17% to .25%, the maximum that may be charged to certain public service companies for a State fiscal year to reimburse the Public Service Commission for certain costs and expenses.
Title
Public Service Commission - Public Utility Regulation Fund - Cap
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 54 |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-01-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-43) |
2020-01-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-01-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {163596/1 Adopted |
2020-01-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-16 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 2 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |