MD HB1023 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Calvert County to adopt a specified ordinance to prohibit littering and to impose specified criminal and civil penalties for a violation of the ordinance.
Title
Calvert County - Litter Control Law - Local Ordinance
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-28 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (127-1) | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-08 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Environmental Matters |