MD HB1024 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an auxiliary winery permit; authorizing the Comptroller to issue the permit to a holder of a Class 4 limited winery permit for use at a single location off the licensed premises in the State, subject to specified restrictions; prohibiting the Comptroller from issuing more than 25 permits in the State and more than one permit per license holder; authorizing the holder of the permit to exercise the privileges with specified exceptions that are allowed at the premises for which the holder's Class 4 license is issued; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery Permit
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] | Del. Christopher Adams [R] | Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] |
Del. Jay Jacobs [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. Charles Otto [R] | Del. April Rose [R] |
Del. Brett Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-9) (Y: 131 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-29 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-9) |
2017-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments {873992/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Comptroller
Fees
Licenses
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Comptroller
Fees
Licenses
Retail Sales