MD HB1024 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program to include certain sewer pipes and diagnostic actions; altering the maximum amount of a loan that may be made under the Program from $5,000 to $10,000; altering the total amount of loans that the Program may provide or have outstanding from $1,000,000 to $2,000,000; and increasing to $200,000 the amount of funding through fiscal year 2034 which the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission must include for the Program in the Commission's budget.
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program - Expansion PG/MC 101-24
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-16 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Bi-County Agencies
Certifications
Equipment
Inspections
Liens
Loans
Notices
Plumbing
Revenue and Taxes
Sewage
Sunset
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Certifications
Equipment
Inspections
Liens
Loans
Notices
Plumbing
Revenue and Taxes
Sewage
Sunset
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Public Utilities | 23 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |