MD HB1025 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a State inspector to provide a podiatry office or facility a specified written notice in accordance with specified requirements under specified circumstances; prohibiting the Department of the Environment from imposing a fine on a podiatry office or facility for a specified violation under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Environment - Radiation Sources - Podiatry Radiation Machines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2012-03-01 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1025.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1025f.pdf |