MD HB1044 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1653
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the clerk of the Circuit Court for Washington County from issuing a certain business license under certain circumstances unless the applicant submits to the clerk a certification that the location of the business for which the license is sought has proper zoning; and prohibiting the clerk of the Circuit Court of Washington County from endorsing a change in a place of business in Washington County until certain zoning requirements are met.
Title
Washington County - Business Licenses - Zoning Certification Requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB1653 (Carry Over) 2020-03-02 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Certifications
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Washington County
Zoning and Planning
Certifications
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Washington County
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 17 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 17 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |