MD HB1074 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an individual or a business entity to claim a credit against the State income tax for the first $500 of the purchase price of an automated external defibrillator purchased for use at a restaurant location in the State with annual gross income of at least $400,000; prohibiting the credit from being claimed more than once by any individual or business entity for each restaurant location; and providing certain other limitations.
Title
Income Tax - Automated External Defibrillator Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306 |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2023-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {263022/1 Adopted |
2023-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB624 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 757 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |