MD HB1082 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the number of Class B-AE (arts and entertainment) alcoholic beverages licenses from 5 to 8 that may be issued in Prince George's County; and prohibiting the Board of License Commissioners of Prince George's County from issuing a new Class A license or transferring an existing Class A license to a location within a specified distance of a correctional facility.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Licenses and Class B-AE Licenses PG 317-13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-0) (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400 |
2013-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-0) |
2013-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {104032/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2013-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {703299/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Correctional Institutions
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Correctional Institutions
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County