MD HB1087 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the services that are subject to the Universal Service Trust Fund surcharge; requiring the surcharge to be applied to specified bills and to be payable at a specified time; altering the maximum amount of a specified surcharge; requiring the Secretary of Information Technology to direct specified companies to add the surcharge to bills for services under specified circumstances; requiring specified companies to act as collection agents for the Fund and to remit proceeds to the Comptroller for deposit in the Fund; etc.
Title
Communications Companies - Universal Service Trust Fund - Surcharge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Motion Special Order until later today (Brochin) Rejected (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Motion Special Order until later today (Brochin) Rejected (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (32-15) | |
2012-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Brochin) Rejected (14-33) | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable | |
2012-04-09 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-04-07 | Re-referred Finance | |
2012-03-31 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2012-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (98-39) | |
2012-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments 723097/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-14 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Communications
Disabilities
Equipment
Fees
Information Technology, Department of
Public Service Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Utilities
Disabilities
Equipment
Fees
Information Technology, Department of
Public Service Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Utilities