MD HB11 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations must provide benefits for expenses arising from in vitro fertilization procedures; providing an exception to the required use of a spouse's sperm to fertilize the oocytes of a patient whose spouse is of the opposite sex; and providing the Act shall apply to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, renewed, or in force in the State on or after July 1, 2016.
Title
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Use of Spouse's Sperm - Exception
Sponsors
Del. Terri Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-8) (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (116-20) (Y: 116 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (116-20) (Y: 116 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326 |
2016-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-8) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-02-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (116-20) |
2016-02-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {676081/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-07-14 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Marriage
Patients
Pregnancy
Sexual Orientation
Women
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Marriage
Patients
Pregnancy
Sexual Orientation
Women