MD HB110 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing in Dorchester County the membership requirements for specified fraternal organizations and armed forces organizations or clubs to obtain a Class C beer, wine and liquor license.
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Clubs - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-19 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-18 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Dorchester County
Nonprofit Organizations
Veterans
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Dorchester County
Nonprofit Organizations
Veterans