MD HB110 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the penalties for stalking if the victim had a protective order in effect against the defendant at the time of the offense or the defendant had previously been convicted of stalking.
Title
Criminal Law - Stalking - Penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-01-07 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2021-09-22 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB429 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-31 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Harassment
Penalties and Sentences
Protection Orders
Repeat Offenders
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Harassment
Penalties and Sentences
Protection Orders
Repeat Offenders
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 3 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |