MD HB1108 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from 32 to 60 the number of times per year a holder of a Class 3 winery license or a Class 4 limited winery license may use a certain special event permit in Washington County.
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Permits for Wineries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663 |
2021-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2021-04-10 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {334338/1 Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Committees and Commissions
Emergency Bills
Health
Notices
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Special Events
Washington County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Committees and Commissions
Emergency Bills
Health
Notices
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Special Events
Washington County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 402.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |