MD HB1110 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the elevated blood lead level that initiates certain case management, environmental investigation, notification, and lead risk reduction requirements; and requiring the Department of the Environment to study and report on the most effective means of incorporating the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention Blood Lead Reference Value into the State's lead poisoning prevention programs on or before December 31, 2022.
Title
Environment - Lead Poisoning Prevention - Elevated Blood Lead Level
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86 |
2022-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {203025/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Environment
Federal Government
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Minors
Reports
Time
Weights and Measures
Environment
Federal Government
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Minors
Reports
Time
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 6 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 6 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 6 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 6 | 819 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 6 | 846 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |