MD HB112 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a Task Force to Study Abuse of Workers' Compensation; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; providing that a member of the Task Force may not receive compensation but may be reimbursed for specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study workers' compensation fraud and abuse and make recommendations on or before December 1, 2014, concerning workers' compensation fraud and abuse prevention strategies and related legislation; and terminating the Act at the end of June 30, 2015.
Title
Task Force to Study Abuse of Workers' Compensation
Sponsors
Del. Melvin Stukes [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Del. Mary Love [D] | Del. Peter Murphy [D] |
Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] | Del. Jay Walker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-01-31 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-16 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Fraud
Insurance
Reports
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Fraud
Insurance
Reports
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation