MD HB1131 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission on the Establishment of a Maryland Educators Service Memorial; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; requiring that the members of the Commission be appointed on or before a specified date; specifying the duties of the Commission; requiring the Commission to report its initial findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2013; etc.
Title
Commission on the Establishment of a Maryland Educators Service Memorial
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570 |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education, State Department of
Monuments and Memorials
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Teachers
Education, State Department of
Monuments and Memorials
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Teachers