MD HB1131 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that, on the termination of any health benefits contract that exists on July 1, 2018, a county, municipal corporation, or county board must enroll and participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; requiring the Program to encompass all units in all county governments, municipal corporations, and county boards; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to adopt certain regulations specifying certain employees who are eligible to participate in the Program with certain subsidies; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Expansion of Participating Units

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
2018-03-01HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
2018-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback