MD HB1150 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 434
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 434
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Budget and Management to use a reverse auction, as provided for in certain provisions of law established by the Act, to select a pharmacy benefits manager or other entity to administer the State Rx Program; requiring the Department to procure a certain platform and associated services in a certain manner a certain period of time before the reverse auction is scheduled to be completed; requiring the Department to consult with certain other Departments in conducting a certain procurement; etc.
Title
State Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Maryland Competitive Pharmacy Benefits Manager Marketplace Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 434 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {816880/1 Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations |
Subjects
Auctions
Budget and Management, Department of
Claims
Commerce and Business
Communications
Contracts
Drugs
Examinations
Fees
Health
Health Insurance
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Insurance - Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Procurement
Public Employees
Records
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Budget and Management, Department of
Claims
Commerce and Business
Communications
Contracts
Drugs
Examinations
Fees
Health
Health Insurance
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Insurance - Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Procurement
Public Employees
Records
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 15 | 1601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 2 | 502.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 2 | 502.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |