MD HB1151 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and the State Department of Education to develop a process through which children receiving services through the Home- and Community-Based Services Waiver for Children with Autism Spectrum Disorder who lose eligibility for waiver services due to specified circumstances are able to resume the receipt of waiver services; and requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and the State Department of Education to adopt specified regulations.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Waiver for Children with Autism Spectrum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn | |
2012-02-28 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Developmental Disabilities
Education, State Department of
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Assistance
Minors
Rules and Regulations
Education, State Department of
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Assistance
Minors
Rules and Regulations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1151.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1151f.pdf |