MD HB1160 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 724
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Breathe Easy East Baltimore Pilot Program in the Baltimore City Health Department to provide and study the effects of asthma remediation services on eligible households; requiring the Department, by July 1, 2020, to select eligible households to participate and provide them with remediation services such as cleaning, education, and structural interventions; requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2024; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health – Breathe Easy East Baltimore Pilot Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 724
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-04SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-04-02SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-29HouseFavorable with Amendments {206681/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-02-13HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback