MD HB1165 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a specified insurer or other provider of required security to immediately provide electronic notice of a specified lapse or termination of required security to the Motor Vehicle Administration and, under specified circustances, the vehicle owner.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Lapse or Termination of Required Security - Notice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Fines
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration