MD HB1192 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain recipients of State funds to install an assistive listening system in an assembly area during construction or renovation of the assembly area if the assembly area uses or requires the use of a public address system and a state contract has been executed; authorizing certain recipients of State funds to apply for a waiver from the requirement of a certain provision of the Act; requiring that the waiver request include a certain description; establishing the Hearing Accessibility Advisory Board; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 336
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (42-0)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {244864/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback