MD HB1219 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain definition of "health care provider" to include pharmacists for the purposes of provisions of law related to the destruction of medical records; and requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to establish a workgroup to identify options and requirements necessary for the reimbursement of pharmacists and submit a report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 31, 2022.
Title
Pharmacists - Status as Health Care Providers and Study on Reimbursement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371 |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-6) |
2022-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {643223/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
AIDS
Claims
Examinations
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Insurance Administration
Laws and Ordinances
Medical Assistance
Medical Malpractice
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Claims
Examinations
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Insurance Administration
Laws and Ordinances
Medical Assistance
Medical Malpractice
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 4 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |