MD HB1224 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each county board of education, beginning in the 2022-2023 school year, to submit a report on or before April 30 each year to the State Board of Education and the General Assembly on computer science courses offered in public schools in the county in the prior school year; requiring each county board to include certain information in the report and post certain data on its website; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Boards of Education - Computer Science Courses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-13HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback