MD HB123 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an exemption from a prohibition against specified homeowners receiving specified property tax credits under specified circumstances; and providing for the application and termination of the Act.
Title
Baltimore City - Residential Retention Property Tax Credit - Modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68 |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-26 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |