MD HB125 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an insurer, with respect to private passenger motor vehicle insurance, from refusing to underwrite, canceling, refusing to renew, rating a risk, or increasing a renewal premium based, in whole or in part, on the gender of the insured or applicant.
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Gender
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-01-11 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2021-10-07 | House | Pre-filed |