MD HB1254 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, on and after January 1, 2024, a certain governmental unit to designate at least one individual licensed by the State Board for Professional Land Surveyors to be in responsible charge of certain land surveying and property line surveying activities practiced by or on behalf of the governmental unit.
Title
Governmental Units - Designation of Individual in Responsible Charge of Land Surveying and Property Line Surveying Activities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
Licenses
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Surveyors
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
Licenses
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Surveyors