MD HB127 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an individual who is at least 21 years old to conduct a home game involving wagering if the home game is conducted in a specified manner; and limiting to $1000 the total amount of money, tokens representing money, or any other thing or consideration of value that may be wagered by all players during any 24-hour period.
Title
Gaming - Home Games
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613 |
2016-04-09 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senators King, Eckardt, and Currie |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2016-04-06 | House | Delegates Ebersole, Fennell, and Hornberger |
2016-04-06 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2016-04-06 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2016-04-06 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {789935/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2016-02-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {805662/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |