MD HB1279 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Police Training Commission to require that the specified entrance-level and in-service police training conducted by the State and each county and municipal police training school include specified training relating to the criminal laws concerning human trafficking, including services and support available to victims and the rights and appropriate treatment of victims; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police Training Commission - Training Requirements - Human Trafficking

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 644
2017-04-07HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (141-0)
2017-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {442512/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2017-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1279&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1279f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1279t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_644_hb1279t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0009/hb1279_44251201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb1279.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb1279_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb1279_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1279,h-0467&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1279,s-1208&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback