MD HB1279 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a certain refill be dispensed in the smallest commercially available package under certain circumstances if a prescription cannot be dispensed or sold in a 14-day or less supply or unit of use.
Title
Pharmacists - Refills of Prescriptions - Dispensing Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {956484/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 12 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |