MD HB1326 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the distribution of the fee collected for performing a marriage ceremony in Harford County to require that $20 be paid to the Historical Society of Harford County, Inc.
Title
Harford County - Disposition of Fee for Performing Marriage Ceremony - Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-09 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (128-2) | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2012-02-28 | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Judiciary | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |