MD HB1327 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that an assessment on an agricultural commodity be collected annually; repealing the requirement that an assessment be deducted by a purchaser on and after the date stated in a specified notification letter; requiring a purchaser to remit an assessment to a certified agency as directed by the Secretary of Agriculture; authorizing a certified agency to initiate judicial proceedings under specified circumstances; and authorizing a specified certified agency to inspect specified books and records.
Title
Agricultural Commodity - Assessment - Collection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2013-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Assessments
Associations
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Inspections
Notices
Records
Referendum
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Assessments
Associations
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Inspections
Notices
Records
Referendum