MD HB1346 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Student Peer Mediation Program Fund to provide grant assistance to schools and community-based organizations in Baltimore City to establish student peer mediation programs to reduce juvenile violence; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Fund; requiring the Governor to appropriate at least $50,000 for the Fund annually; requiring the Executive Director to establish grant application procedures for schools and community-based organizations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Student Peer Mediation Program Fund - Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {879737/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {134169/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-03-05HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-01HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-18HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1346&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1346f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1346t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1346e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_736_hb1346e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1346_13416901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1346_87973701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb1346.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1346_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0661.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1346_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1585.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1380.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback