MD HB135 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that manufacturing, distributing, dispensing, or possessing certain large quantities of certain controlled dangerous substances is a felony; authorizing a certain person serving a certain term of confinement for an offense relating to volume dealing in cocaine base or cannabis or a drug kingpin with regard to cocaine base or cannabis imposed on or before a certain date to file a certain motion to modify or reduce the sentence under certain circumstances; altering the penalties for certain crimes related to firearms; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances and Firearms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - Floor Amendment 793823/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (Y: 35 N: 99 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - Floor Amendment 793823/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (Y: 35 N: 99 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted (34-13) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment {753825/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment {203128/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {603620/1 Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-38) |
2023-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-17 | House | Floor Amendment {793823/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (35-99) |
2023-03-16 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {633420/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2023-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB946 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-05 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Age of Majority
Cannabis
Cannabis Production
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Dealers
Guns
Hearings
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners
Cannabis
Cannabis Production
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Dealers
Guns
Hearings
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 5 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 5 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 5 | 612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 5 | 612.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 5 | 613 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 5 | 613.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |