MD HB1365 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1097
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a private construction contract to include a provision requiring the owner to pay the contractor within 45 days after the receipt of a proper invoice following completion of the work or, if the owner withholds all or part of an amount invoiced, to send a certain notification to the contractor; requiring a contract between a contractor and a subcontractor on a private or State construction contract to include a provision requiring the contractor to pay the subcontractor within 7 days after receipt of payment; etc.
Title
State and Private Construction Contracts and State Procurement Contracts - Prompt Payment and Interest Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Hearing canceled (Economic Matters) |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB715 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB1097 (Carry Over) 2023-03-06 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB1097 (Carry Over) 2023-03-06 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Business Regulation
Commerce and Business
Construction
Contractors
Contracts
Interest
Notices
Prices
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Commerce and Business
Construction
Contractors
Contracts
Interest
Notices
Prices
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 17 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 17 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 13 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 15 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1365?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/hb/hb1365f.pdf |