MD SB715 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a private construction contract to include a provision requiring the owner to pay the contractor within 45 days after the receipt of a proper invoice following completion of the work or, if the owner withholds all or part of an amount invoiced, to send a certain notification to the contractor; requiring a contract between a contractor and a subcontractor on a private or State construction contract to include a provision requiring the contractor to pay the subcontractor within 7 days after receipt of payment; etc.
Title
State and Private Construction Contracts and State Procurement Contracts – Prompt Payment and Interest Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] | Sen. Dawn Gile [D] | Sen. Michael Jackson [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Sen. Johnny Salling [R] | Sen. Chris West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1365 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-27 - Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Subjects
Business Regulation
Commerce and Business
Construction
Contractors
Contracts
Interest
Notices
Prices
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Commerce and Business
Construction
Contractors
Contracts
Interest
Notices
Prices
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 17 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 17 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 13 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 15 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |