MD HB137 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to recover unemployment insurance benefits by assessment in the same manner as provided in a specified provision of law for the assessment of past due contributions; requiring the Secretary, if the Secretary seeks to recover specified unemployment benefits by assessment, to allow a claimant to elect within 30 days of the date of the notice of assessment to have the amount collected by suit instead of by assessment; etc.
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by Assessment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245 |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2017-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {103394/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-01-26 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Assessments
Debt Collection
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Debt Collection
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance