MD HB1384 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Implementing the German Academic-Apprenticeship Model for Adults Without a High School Education; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations on or before December 1, 2018; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study Implementing the German Academic-Apprenticeship Model for Adults Without a High School Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-18 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Apprentices
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Sunset