MD HB1388 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program within the Department of Commerce; authorizing certain individuals and corporations to receive a grant equal to 25% of the qualified capital expenses incurred in connection with establishing new wineries and vineyards or completing capital improvements at existing wineries and vineyards; requiring the Governor each year to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of at least $1,000,000 to be used for grants under the Program; etc.
Title
Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-1) |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2022-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2022-02-15 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB594 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Subjects
Agriculture
Appropriations
Beverage Containers
Budgets
Capital Budgets
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Economic Development
Equipment
Farmland
Grants
Operating Budget
Weights and Measures
Appropriations
Beverage Containers
Budgets
Capital Budgets
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Economic Development
Equipment
Farmland
Grants
Operating Budget
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 5 | 1901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |