MD HB1401 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 715
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 715
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a State grant to be made available to fund the increased operating expenses for the branches of the Enoch Pratt Free Library that increase their operating hours above the hours in effect as of January 1, 2016; requiring the Governor to include in the State operating budget, in fiscal years 2018 through 2022, $3,000,000 in general funds to support the increased Library operating expenses; requiring Baltimore City to provide a 25% match for each dollar of State funds granted to support increased Library expenses; etc.
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Hours of Operation - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-44) (Y: 93 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-32) (Y: 100 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-32) (Y: 100 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 715 |
2016-04-06 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-44) |
2016-04-06 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {369231/2 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {369231/2 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-32) |
2016-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {385469/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Budgets
Counties - Local Laws
Education - Local Bills
Education, State Department of
Grants
Libraries
Reports
Time
Budgets
Counties - Local Laws
Education - Local Bills
Education, State Department of
Grants
Libraries
Reports
Time