MD HB1421 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to conduct outreach and education activities to increase health literacy and to educate consumers about the Exchange and insurance affordability programs; and requiring the Exchange to perform certain functions for Maryland Medical Assistance programs, as requested by the Maryland Department of Health and approved by the Board of Trustees for the Exchange, for the efficient administration of Maryland Medical Assistance programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Functions and Outreach

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 391
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-04SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-04-02SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-29HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-13HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-03-04HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback