MD HB1422 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt regulations that require a kidney dialysis center to have an emergency backup generator in working condition on the premises.
Title
Kidney Dialysis Centers - Emergency Backup Generators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn | |
2010-03-11 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-03-10 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-08 | Re-referred Health and Government Operations | |
2010-02-23 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Emergencies
Equipment
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Rules and Regulations
Equipment
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Rules and Regulations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB1422.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb1422f.pdf |