MD HB1423 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Calvert County, before submitting a legislative proposal to the Calvert County Delegation for introduction as a bill in a session of the General Assembly, to post notice, send specified e-mails, and hold a public hearing on the proposal at least 3 months before the start of the General Assembly session; and providing an exception for a legislative proposal to the county delegation for introduction as an emergency bill in a session of the General Assembly.
Title
Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Notice and Hearing on Proposed Legislation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {513397/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Calvert County
Electronic Communication
General Assembly
Hearings
Legislation
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Public Information
Calvert County
Electronic Communication
General Assembly
Hearings
Legislation
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Public Information